Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the St. Mary's County Sheriff to establish a pretrial release program and a prerelease program; authorizing a certain inmate to leave a certain detention center for certain purposes; repealing a provision authorizing the Sheriff and the Board of County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to charge a certain inmate a certain amount or fee to pay for certain costs; requiring the Sheriff or the Sheriff's designee to collect the earnings of a certain inmate, less any payroll deduction required by law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM