Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Students – Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker, Acevero, Anderson, Anderton, B. Barnes, Bartlett, Branch, Bridges, Bromwell, Brooks, Cardin, Carey, Charles, Conaway, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.E. Davis, Fennell, M. Fisher, W. Fisher, Gaines, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Glenn, Healey, Hill, Holmes, Hornberger, Ivey, Jackson, Jacobs, Kipke, Lehman, J. Lewis, Lierman, Long, McKay, Metzgar, Moon, Morgan, Mosby, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Reznik, Smith, Stein, Sydnor, Szeliga, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Washington, R. Watson, Wilson, Kaiser, D. Barnes, Boteler, Buckel, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring physical education to be provided in each public school in a planned and sequential manner to all students, prekindergarten through grade 12, for the purpose of developing the students' good health and physical fitness and to improve motor coordination and physical skills; providing as a goal of the State that each student receive a program totaling 150 minutes each week of developmentally appropriate, moderate-to-vigorous activity, including 90 minutes of physical education and recess; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {975264/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764930/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Elementary School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {975264/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Public School Students – Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments {764930/1 Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-409, 7-409.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM