Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Lead Registry and Code Compliance - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to include with a required notice of the homestead property tax credit certain information regarding the homeowner's obligation, under certain circumstances, to register property constructed before 1978 located in the sixth legislative district of Baltimore County with the Maryland Department of the Environment and comply with certain building and housing codes; terminating the Act after September 30, 2023; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Lead Registry and Code Compliance - Pilot Program
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:35 PM