Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Attar, Barve, Boyce, Bridges, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Harrison, Healey, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, Lehman, Love, Otto, Parrott, Stein, Stewart, Wells, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing the serious physical injury or death of a vulnerable individual as a result of the person operating a vehicle in a careless or distracted manner or in violation of any other rules of the road provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law; establishing that a person convicted of a violation of the Act may be fined up to $2,000 and must appear in court and may not prepay the fine; establishing additional penalties of participation in a motor vehicle safety course and up to 150 hours of community service; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0804
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1099 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640816/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {640816/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-145, 21-901.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM