Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Brooks, and A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Comptroller, when setting the annual interest rate for tax deficiencies and refunds, round the interest rate to the nearest whole number.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {929438/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {929438/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text - Chapter - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM