Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $4,549,000, the proceeds to be used as grants to the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the Maryland State Department of Education for specified development or improvement purposes; providing for the disbursement of the loan proceeds and the further grant of funds to eligible school systems for specified purposes, subject to a requirement that the grantees document the provision of a required matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0141
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/25/2013 3/22/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Jones) Adopted 55
House 3/25/2013 3/22/2013 Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 55
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 55A
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 54
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM