Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Moon
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain penalties for a person who displays a canceled, revoked, or suspended driver's license; and providing that a person who violates a certain section of the Act must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0020
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/12/2020
Legislative Date
6/12/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {660419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-5)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 6/12/2020 6/12/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {660419/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (127-5) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:59 PM
Click to return on the top page