Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud
Sponsored by
Delegates Mitchell, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Cullison, Gutierrez, Haynes, McDermott, Oaks, B. Robinson, and Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding abuse or neglect of a vulnerable adult and offenses relating to Medicaid fraud to those crimes for which specified evidence may be gathered by, and a judge may grant an order authorizing, interception of oral, wire, or electronic communications.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0267
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 27
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 26
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM