Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Industry Automobile Insurance Association - Board of Directors
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the nominating entity for four board members of the Industry Automobile Insurance Association to reflect the merger of the American Insurance Association and the Property Casualty Insurers Association of America into the American Property Casualty Insurers Association.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0165
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103691/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
18
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Insurance - Industry Automobile Insurance Association - Board of Directors
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {103691/1 Adopted 15
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Text - Third - Insurance - Industry Automobile Insurance Association - Board of Directors
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 17
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Referred Finance 18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 12:10 PM