Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Rogers
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a business, credit card processor, and vendor to take reasonable care to protect against unauthorized access to personal information connected to credit and debit cards in accordance with certain provisions of law; establishing that a business, credit card processor, or vendor is liable to a certain financial institution for certain reimbursement under certain circumstances; providing that a business, credit card processor, or vendor is not liable to a certain financial institution under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0217
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/09/2020
Legislative Date
10/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2021
Legislative Date
1/14/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/09/2020 10/09/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
House 1/14/2021 1/14/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 1/26/2021 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page