Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental Entities
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a governmental entity notify the State Board of Elections if a person doing public business with the governmental entity fails to file a specified statement; requiring a specified governmental entity to provide the State Board with specified information; authorizing the governmental entity to comply with a specified provision of the Act by sending a specified quarterly report to the State Board no later than 10 business days after the close of each calendar quarter; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0632
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {555564/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284932/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental Entities
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {555564/1 Adopted 28
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental Entities
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 30
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {284932/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Persons Doing Public Business - Reporting by Governmental Entities
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM