Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Transferring the Seafood Marketing and Aquaculture Development Program, the Seafood Marketing Fund, the Seafood Program Management Team, the Innovative Seafood Technologies Program, and the Seafood Marketing Advisory Commission from the Department of Natural Resources to the Department of Agriculture; establishing the Seafood and Aquaculture Products Marketing Fund to facilitate the marketing of seafood and aquaculture products; naming the Department of Agriculture as the lead agency for the marketing of aquaculture products; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {290418/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {290418/1 Adopted 35
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Rules 36
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text - Chapter - Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1001, 10-1002, 10-10A-01, 10-10B-01, 10-1101, 2-106 )
(   4-11A-03, 4-11B-01, 4-11B-02, 4-11C-01, 4-11D-01, 4-11E-01, 4-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM