Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - No Net Loss of Forest - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Fraser-Hidalgo, Acevero, Bridges, Brooks, Cain, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Ebersole, Gilchrist, Ivey, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lisanti, Lopez, Luedtke, Moon, Qi, Solomon, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standard for achieving a no net loss of forest policy by altering the definition of "no net loss of forest" to mean that 40% of all land in Maryland is covered by forest land.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0203
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - No Net Loss of Forest - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - No Net Loss of Forest - Definition
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM