Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate W. Fisher
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Reparations Commission; providing for the composition, staffing, chair and vice chair, and terms of the members of the Commission; providing that the purpose of the Commission is to develop and administer a program for the provision of compensatory benefits to the descendants of individuals enslaved in the State; providing that any individual whose ancestors were enslaved in the State is eligible to receive benefits administered by the Commission; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1201 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/22/2020
Legislative Date
10/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 10/22/2020 10/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
(   9-3301 through 9-3308 )
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page