Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Atterbeary, Barron, Bartlett, Crutchfield, W. Fisher, Hettleman, Lopez, Malone, Moon, Shetty, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (117-18)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Removing rape and certain sexual offenses from the list of offenses alleged to have been committed by a certain respondent against a certain victim for which a peace order petition may be filed under certain circumstances; and altering the definition of "person eligible for relief" for purposes of certain provisions of law to include an individual who alleges the commission of rape or a certain sexual offense or attempted rape or sexual offense in any degree by a certain respondent.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {972813/2 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 02/21 (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 02/22 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {743827/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Rejected (36-103)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-21)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
35A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388470/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Shetty and Lopez)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Shetty and Lopez)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Hester and Carter)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Hester and Carter)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {233725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-18)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {233725/1
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {972813/2 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Motion Special Order until 02/21 (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted 31
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Motion Special Order until 02/22 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted 32
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Floor Amendment {743827/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Rejected (36-103) 33
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (114-21) 35
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 35A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {388470/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Shetty and Lopez) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Shetty and Lopez) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Hester and Carter) 62A
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Hester and Carter) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Conference Committee Report {233725/1 Adopted 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (117-18) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Conference Committee Report {233725/1 66
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM