Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Declaring certain findings of the General Assembly regarding the educational needs and the health and safety of student athletes; prohibiting a public institution of higher education or certain organizations from preventing a student athlete from earning compensation from the use of the athlete's name, image or likeness; prohibiting a public institution of higher education from providing a prospective student athlete with certain compensation or preventing the athlete from obtaining certain legal representation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0439
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/08/2020
Legislative Date
9/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {323921/1 (Delegate Walker) Rejected
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-12)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/08/2020 9/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
House 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {723922/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Walker) Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {323921/1 (Delegate Walker) Rejected 17AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (122-12) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page