Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Moon
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 364
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a pretrial services program that receives a certain grant from charging a fee to a defendant for participation in the program; and extending the termination date of the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund to June 30, 2028.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0229
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0082 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/16/2020
Legislative Date
6/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-2)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 364
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/16/2020 6/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (126-2) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Returned Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 364
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:20 AM
Click to return on the top page