Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - Scope
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of "consumer" under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act to include a specified organization that purchases, rents, or leases goods or services for the benefit of the members of the organization; expanding the definition of "consumer goods" and "consumer services" under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act to include specified goods and services purchased, rented, or leased by a specified organization for the benefit of members of the organization; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-25)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {857275/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {833428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-3)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (111-25) 48A
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Finance 48
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {857275/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {833428/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (126-3) 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM