Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain health benefit plans and certain carriers to provide a special enrollment period during which individuals who become pregnant may enroll in a health benefit plan; establishing a 90-day duration for the special enrollment period beginning on the date a pregnancy is confirmed by a health care practitioner; establishing certain effective dates of coverage; requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to report to certain legislative committees on the use of the special enrollment period by January 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0036
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {656082/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed 47-0
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {656082/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Finance 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed 47-0 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1201, 15-1208.1, 15-1316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM