Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Chang, and Sophocleus
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 767
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination of a distribution of certain local impact grant funds from video lottery terminal proceeds to communities within 3 miles of the Laurel Race Course.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0032
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 767
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 32
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 33
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-1) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 767
Text - Chapter - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM