Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration and Baltimore City Department of Transportation – Study of Dedicated Bus Lanes
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Anderson, Boyce, Bridges, Conaway, Glenn, Lierman, Mosby, Smith, and Wells
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration and the Baltimore City Department of Transportation to study and analyze dedicated bus lane enforcement mechanisms in use by peer transit agencies and develop a certain enforcement plan; requiring the study to include an overview of best practices and technologies, a review of potential costs, and an evaluation of the most effective methods for ensuring compliance with and enforcement of existing law; requiring a report on the findings of the study be submitted by December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0749 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {170911/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {170911/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration – Workgroup to Study Dedicated Bus Lanes in Baltimore City
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {170911/1 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo) Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {170911/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration and Baltimore City Department of Transportation – Study of Dedicated Bus Lanes
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transit Administration and Baltimore City Department of Transportation – Study of Dedicated Bus Lanes
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM