Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to provide a certain inmate with a certain step-down program to prepare an inmate for transition to the general population or the community; establishing the requirements of a certain step-down program; prohibiting an inmate with less than 180 days until release from being denied access to a certain program, except under certain circumstances; requiring the Commissioner of Correction to document a certain justification in writing; authorizing a certain civil action for damages; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/14/2020
Legislative Date
9/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/14/2020 9/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:41 PM
Click to return on the top page