Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Malone, Atterbeary, Chang, Crutchfield, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Lisanti, Luedtke, McKay, Parrott, Rose, Shetty, Shoemaker, Stein, Stewart, Sydnor, Valderrama, K. Young, and Cardin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to order a defendant convicted of a charge of animal cruelty under the Act, as a condition of sentencing, to participate in and pay for psychological counseling and to pay, in addition to any other fines and costs, all reasonable costs incurred in removing, housing, treating, or euthanizing an animal confiscated from the defendant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0152
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {252315/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Reassigned to Judiciary 13
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {252315/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-604, 10-606, 10-607, 10-608 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM