Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Bartlett, Ebersole, Hettleman, Lafferty, R. Lewis, Moon, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and periodically update certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring each State building constructed, acquired, or substantially altered by the State to meet the standards to the extent practicable and within budgetary constraints; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing State buildings in a certain manner; and establishing that certain requirements do not apply to certain contracts or projects.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0314
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0986 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {936284/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {936284/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Text - Third - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (93-40) 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM