Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a nonairport taxicab operator from soliciting commercial passengers at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; requiring a nonairport taxicab operator to immediately depart the Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport terminal after dropping off a commercial passenger; authorizing a certain taxicab operator to park in a public parking lot at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; establishing a civil penalty of up to $500 for violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363191/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-3)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
House 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {363191/1 Adopted 21
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
Text - Third - Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 23
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Referred Finance 24
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-3) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM