Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $5,000 to $100,000 the amount of the Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit that certain individuals with a certain amount of student loan debt may claim against the State income tax; increasing from $9,000,000 to $100,000,000 the total amount of tax credits that the Maryland Higher Education Commission may approve in a taxable year; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/24/2020
Legislative Date
10/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2021
Legislative Date
1/07/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/24/2020 10/24/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax – Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Alteration of Credit Amounts
House 1/07/2021 1/07/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/1/2021 10:02 AM
Click to return on the top page