Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Child Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain taxpayers with federal adjusted gross income for the taxable year that is $6,000 or less to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain dependent children under certain circumstances; providing that the credit is equal to $500 for each qualified child; allowing certain taxpayers to claim a refund in the amount of any excess credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020, but before January 1, 2026; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0218
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0912 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/21/2020
Legislative Date
8/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Child Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/21/2020 8/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Child Tax Credit
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:41 PM
Click to return on the top page