Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Fee on Commercial Feed
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Attar, Bagnall, Bartlett, Crutchfield, Forbes, Johnson, D. Jones, Krimm, McComas, Ruth, Solomon, Terrasa, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing a certain fee, from $100 to $125 beginning October 1, 2022, and from $125 to $150 beginning October 1, 2027, on commercial feed prepared and distributed for consumption by dogs or cats and registered in the State in a certain manner; and extending the termination date to September 30, 2032, for provisions of law relating to the Spay/Neuter Fund.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Fee on Commercial Feed
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:49 PM