Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Transfers
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the transfer of certain alcoholic beverages licenses from certain areas in Baltimore City to other areas in Baltimore City; specifying that a certain license is considered unexpired until July 1, 2019, for a certain purpose; and specifying that, unless transferred to another location, a certain license expires not later than July 1, 2019.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0118
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Transfers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Transfers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824433/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Transfers
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Transfers
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {824433/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-1706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM