Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2020, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013, 2014, 2016, 2017, and 2019
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of One Billion, One Hundred and Four Million, One Hundred Fourteen Thousand Dollars ($1,104,114,000), the proceeds to be used for certain necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring certain real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to certain subdivisions and other organizations for certain development and improvement purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0191
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, June 1, 2021, June 1, 2022, June 1, 2023
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:37 PM