Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Vallario, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Glenn, Hough, Ivey, McComas, McDermott, Mitchell, Parrott, Smigiel, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the representation provided by the Office of the Public Defender to an indigent individual at a bail hearing before a District Court or circuit court judge shall be limited solely to the bail hearing and shall terminate automatically at the conclusion of the hearing; and establishing a exception.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {282218/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed ((116-18)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688379/2
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Getty) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688379/2
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Frosh) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Frosh) {103225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Delegates Vallario, Swain, and Smigiel
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {282218/1 Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed ((116-18) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 35
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {688379/2 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Getty) Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {688379/2 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Frosh) Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Frosh) {103225/1 Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12) 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Delegates Vallario, Swain, and Smigiel 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM