Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Affordability Board – Upper Payment Limits and Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain requirement that the Prescription Drug Affordability Board, in conjunction with a certain council, draft a certain plan for setting upper payment limits for prescription drug products; altering the date by which the Board is required to submit the plan to a certain committee of the General Assembly; requiring, rather than authorizing, the Board to set upper payment limits for certain prescription drug products and altering the date by which the limits are to be set to on or after February 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2020
Legislative Date
10/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 10/25/2020 10/25/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Prescription Drug Affordability Board – Upper Payment Limits and Reports
(   2019, 2020 )
Last Updated: 1/24/2021 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page