Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "adjusted actual income" under the State child support guidelines; providing for the calculation of a specified allowance required to be deducted from adjusted actual income under the child support guidelines; requiring that the amount of a specified allowance be subtracted from a parent's actual income before the court determines the amount of a child support award; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0849 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-35)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (99-35) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201, 12-202, 12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM