Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Recipient Benefits
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the age from 55 to 50 years old at which specified individuals may begin to receive benefits under the Length of Service Award Program for Calvert County; altering from $4 to $10 per month an additional amount that is payable under the Program for specified volunteer service; repealing a limit on a maximum benefit payable under the Program; authorizing a specified death benefit to be paid to an alternate beneficiary if a volunteer dies and is unmarried at the time of death; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0230
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM