Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to disaggregate certain discipline-related data in an electronic spreadsheet format for the Department's website; requiring certain discipline-related data to be available as a data download; requiring the Department to provide certain discipline-related data to the public in an accessible electronic spreadsheet format; requiring the Department to report on student discipline data to the Governor and the General Assembly by August 1 each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0328 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:50 PM