Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty and McIntosh
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Stating that the Act seeks to deconcentrate poverty by providing opportunities for tenants utilizing public subsidies to live in neighborhoods other than the neighborhoods in which they are currently and disproportionately residing; expanding the housing policy of the state to include fair housing regardless of source of income; requiring the owner of an apartment complex to rent or make available 15% of the units to persons receiving housing assistance vouchers; prohibiting specified discrimination based on source of income; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0728
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0759 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Home Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {610419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {583128/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-84)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {903326/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (46-86)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {433525/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (42-84)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {313123/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (44-87)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Home Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (95-46)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-53)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Home Act of 2017
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {610419/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {583128/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-84) 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {903326/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (46-86) 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {433525/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (42-84) 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {313123/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (44-87) 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Home Act of 2017
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (95-46) 51
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (88-53) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1103, 20-701, 20-702, 20-704, 20-704.1, 20-705, 20-705.1, 20-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM