Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Voter Registration Deadlines
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Board of Elections)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that require the State Board of Elections and a local board of elections to be open for business during certain hours on a certain date; and altering the period during which voter registration is closed before an election.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {595068/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854430/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Election Law – Voter Registration Deadlines
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law – Voter Registration Deadlines
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Voter Registration Deadlines and Security of Voter Registration Information
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {595068/1 Adopted 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Election Law - Voter Registration Deadlines and Security of Voter Registration Information
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {854430/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law – Voter Registration Deadlines
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Text - Chapter - Election Law – Voter Registration Deadlines
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-302, 3-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM