Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying certain provisions of law governing Sunday hunting in the State; establishing the authority of the Department of Natural Resources to allow Sunday hunting under certain circumstances; altering the application of authorized Sunday hunting to junior hunts and holders of a deer management permit; prohibiting hunting on certain public land on Sunday; repealing a certain termination provision governing authorized Sunday hunting in Montgomery County; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {550319/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {550319/1 Adopted 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Rules 42
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:03 AM