Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Anne Arundel County Detention Officers
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the presumption of compensability under the workers' compensation law to include, under specified conditions, Anne Arundel County detention officers who suffer from heart disease or hypertension resulting in partial or total disability or death; requiring Anne Arundel County detention officers to submit specified medical disclosures to the Anne Arundel County Sheriff; allowing benefits under the Act to be added to retirement benefits subject to a specified limitation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0135
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {673198/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-5)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {673198/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (129-5) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Finance 42
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-503, 9-628 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM