Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Ghrist, and Jacobs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding to the Baltimore Metropolitan Council a member who is appointed by the Board of County Commissioners of Queen Anne's County; providing that the new member serves at the pleasure of the Board; and providing that a Delegate or Senator who represents a district located in Queen Anne's County may be appointed as a member of the Council.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0212
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Finance 36
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Text - Chapter - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-302, 13-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM