Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Frederick County to the list of counties in which specified nonprofit fraternal, religious, and war veterans' organizations may own and operate not more than five slot machines under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0314
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0151 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM