Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
Sponsored by
Delegate Henson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an ammunition vendor to confirm identification and conduct a background check on a purchaser or transferee of ammunition before the sale or transfer of ammunition; prohibiting an ammunition vendor from completing the purchase or the transfer of ammunition to the purchaser or transferee if the results of the background check indicate that the purchaser or transferee is prohibited from possessing a firearm; prohibiting an ammunition vendor from selling or transferring ammunition without making a certain electronic record; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/14/2020
Legislative Date
10/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/14/2020 10/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
(   5-701 through 5-705 )
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 5:19 PM
Click to return on the top page