Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative Defense
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Morhaim, Anderson, Carter, Conaway, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, and Vallario
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that it is an affirmative defense to a prosecution for the possession of marijuana or the possession of specified drug paraphernalia that the marijuana or drug paraphernalia was intended for medical use by an individual with a specified debilitating medical condition for whom the defendant is a specified caregiver; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0580
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1809 Session: 2012 1st Special Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {492717/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-40)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {492717/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (92-40) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 31
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM