Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsored by
Dorchester County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Dorchester County Sanitary Commission to request the county tax collector to conduct a sale of real property to enforce a lien representing any unpaid benefit assessment or other specified charges, in accordance with the same procedures governing the sale of property for delinquent property taxes; and authorizing the tax collector in Dorchester County to conduct a county tax sale for the purpose of enforcing a specified lien.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0076
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-658 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM