Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Atterbeary, Attar, Boyce, Bromwell, Brooks, Ebersole, Guyton, Hettleman, Ivey, Jalisi, Jones, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Malone, McComas, McKay, Patterson, Rosenberg, Stein, Terrasa, Valderrama, C. Watson, Kittleman, Arikan, Bartlett, Cox, W. Fisher, Grammer, Hartman, Lopez, Pippy, Shetty, and R. Watson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering prohibited actions relating to electronic harassment of minors; prohibiting a person from maliciously engaging in an electronic communication if the electronic communication, as part of a series of communications, has the effect of intimidating or harassing a minor and causing physical injury or serious emotional distress to a minor and the person engaging in the electronic communication acts with a certain intent; prohibiting a person from violating the Act with the intent to induce a minor to commit suicide; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0103
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {732611/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {732611/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53A
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-805 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM