Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 413-19
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on residential or commercial real property equipped with security camera systems for a certain purpose; specifying the amount of the property tax credit, subject to certain limitations; authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0231 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 413-19
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 413-19
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 42
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 413-19
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM