Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsored by
Delegates Braveboy, B. Robinson, Glenn, Anderson, Barkley, Barnes, Bobo, Branch, Burns, Cane, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Dumais, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hammen, Harper, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Summers, Swain, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Zucker, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the amount of the State minimum wage rate as of January 1, 2015 as $8.20 per hour for the 12-month period; providing annual increases in the State minimum wage in 2016 and 2017; authorizing specified amusement and recreational establishments to pay specified employees a specified wage under specified circumstances; repealing specified exemptions from provision of law related to the payment of overtime wages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1204 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393994/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-48)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {393994/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (87-48) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-403, 3-413, 3-415, 3-419, 3-427 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM