Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Bagnall, Cullison, Kelly, R. Lewis, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Stewart, Terrasa, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Health Care Coverage in the Maryland Department of Health to establish and carry out the HealthcareMaryland Program to provide benefits to State residents who do not receive federal benefits through Medicare, TRICARE, plans that are subject to ERISA, or any other federal medical program; requiring the Office to contract with a certain number of managed care organizations; requiring certain employers to pay to the Secretary of Labor a certain annual payroll tax; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0378 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1001 through 2-1006 )
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:55 PM