Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission develop standards for the mandatory psychological evaluation of a certain law enforcement officer; requiring the Commission to develop standards for the mandatory psychological consultation with a certain law enforcement officer; repealing a requirement that a certain psychological evaluation for a police officer certification be conducted by a psychologist approved by the Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {612616/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {612616/1 Adopted 26
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Text - Third - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 28
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 29
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-207, 3-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM