Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "adjusted actual income" under the State child support guidelines; providing for the calculation of a specified allowance required to be deducted from adjusted actual income under the child support guidelines; requiring that the amount of a specified allowance be subtracted from a parent's actual income before the court determines the amount of a child support award; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0163 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-52)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (84-52) 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 27
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201, 12-202, 12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM